Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Carmine Pellerano, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malta

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1702BornMazarien
3 Mar 172624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
28 May 177068.3AppointedBishop of Malta
25 Aug 177068.6Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
18 Mar 178078.1ResignedBishop of Malta
19 Jun 178078.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
18 Apr 178381.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Malta

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carmine Pellerano:
Archbishop Giovanni Carmine Pellerano O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malta

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 357
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013