Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Franco

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1700³BornSeminara
5 Dec 172322.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 173635.9AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
30 Nov 173635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
10 May 174544.3AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
20 Apr 1777³76.3DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Franco:
Bishop Francesco Franco (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123, and Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015