Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe di Marsciano

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1696³BornModena
31 Mar 172528.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 172528.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 173437.6AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
2 Feb 173437.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
2 Jul 175458.1DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe di Marsciano:
Bishop Giuseppe di Marsciano (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015