Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Venditti (Vinditti)

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1688³BornArpino
20 Feb 171223.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 173748.4AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
12 May 173748.5Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
8 Jun 176778.5DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Venditti (Vinditti):
Bishop Andreas Venditti (Vinditti) (born , died ) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015