Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Rull, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1691³BornPollensa, Spain
6 Mar 171826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
22 Oct 175766.2SelectedBishop of Malta
19 Dec 175766.4ConfirmedBishop of Malta
7 May 175866.8Ordained BishopBishop of Malta
27 Jun 175866.9InstalledBishop of Malta
19 Feb 176977.6DiedBishop of Malta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Rull:
Bishop Bartolomé Rull O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Malta

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,481
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 76, Number 378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013