Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano MorÓbito

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1712³BornReggio Calabria
25 Feb 173623.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 175240.0AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
30 Nov 175240.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
7 May 176451.5ResignedBishop of Bova, Italy
10 Aug 178067.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano MorÓbito:
Bishop Stefano MorÓbito (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bova

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1763
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1752, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015