Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Spadea

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aquino e Pontecorvo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1686BornMonte Paone
21 Dec 170923.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 174255.2AppointedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
28 Jan 174255.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
14 Apr 175164.4ResignedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
22 Jul 175669.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Spadea:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Spadea (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aquino e Pontecorvo

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1756
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014