Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Giannettasio

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1704Born
7 Jun 172723.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 175248.8AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
30 Nov 175248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
31 Mar 176561.1DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Giannettasio
Bishop Gerardo Giannettasio (born , died ) Bishop of Lavello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSieti

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018