Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Bonaventura

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1711Born
18 Dec 173423.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 175341.9AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
30 Nov 175341.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
15 Jun 178876.4DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Bonaventura
Bishop Francesco Antonio Bonaventura (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast