Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Guacci

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1696BornCanale
30 Mar 172024.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 175256.6AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
30 Nov 175256.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
Aug 1754³58.3DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Guacci:
Bishop Giacomo Guacci (born , died Aug 1754) Bishop of Belcastro

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015