Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Maria Albertini, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1715BornCimitile
173115.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
7 Sep 173822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
13 Jul 176145.8AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
19 Jul 176145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
26 May 176650.7DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Maria Albertini:
Bishop Gennaro Maria Albertini C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 152
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013