Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Torre, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minori, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1713Born
26 May 173623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
25 Jan 176248.6AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
31 Jan 176248.6Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
24 Dec 179178.5DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Torre
Bishop Andrea Torre C.P.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Minori

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmalfi

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 290
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018