Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonino Ganini

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1710Born
19 Sep 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 176352.4AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
30 Jan 176352.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
15 Jan 179584.3DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Ganini
Archbishop Antonino Ganini (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJatrinoli

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,786
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,763, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast