Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomaso Ignazio Maria Natta, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1710Born
26 Jul 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Mar 175948.5SelectedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
4 Apr 175948.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
8 Apr 175948.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
27 Jun 176352.9ResignedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
4 Jul 176655.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tomaso Ignazio Maria Natta
Archbishop Tomaso Ignazio Maria Natta O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato
Death PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 6
  • d/loc: CB, 17 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 17 Aug 2019

Quantcast