Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Antonio de la Riva y Mazo

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1720³BornRendo de Piégalos, Spain
9 Dec 176545.3AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
11 Jun 176645.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
8 Dec 176848.3DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio de la Riva y Mazo:
Archbishop Francisco Antonio de la Riva y Mazo (born Aug 1720, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 83, Number 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015