Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Cano Nieto, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1711Born
10 Sep 177059.6AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
21 Oct 177059.7Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
7 Apr 178069.2DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Cano Nieto
Bishop Alonso Cano Nieto O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoto del Cuervo

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 88, Number 445
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast