Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Gómez de la Torre y Jaraveitia

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1708Born
17 Aug 176153.3AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
6 Dec 176153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
28 May 177062.1AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
23 Mar 177970.9DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gómez de la Torre y Jaraveitia
Bishop Antonio Gómez de la Torre y Jaraveitia (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilbao

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 79, Number 394
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 225, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018