Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Joaquín Soria

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1712³BornSalamanca
13 Sep 177361.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
30 Nov 177361.8Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
29 Oct 178472.7DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Joaquín Soria:
Bishop Antonio Joaquín Soria (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 91, Number 463
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 37
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015