Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Ferrer y Figueredo

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1729³Born
29 Jun 175222.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 176535.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
14 Jul 176535.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
23 Jun 177747.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Zamora, Spain
14 Feb 178555.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Málaga, Spain
21 Jul 179970.0DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ferrer y Figueredo
Archbishop Manuel Ferrer y Figueredo (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 82, Number 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,765, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205, and Page 274
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast