Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Agustín Estévez y Ugarte

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1745Born
24 Jul 179752.3AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
21 Oct 179853.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
8 May 182782.1DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Pedro Agustín Estévez y Ugarte
Bishop Pedro Agustín Estévez y Ugarte (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Orotava, Spain

  • a bishop for 28.5 years

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 401
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,026
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 118, Number 620
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast