Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Velarde Velarde

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1719Born
22 Apr 176545.3AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
14 Jul 176545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
1 Mar 177959.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
12 Jun 178262.4DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Velarde Velarde
Archbishop Bernardo Velarde Velarde (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantillana del Mar

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 137, and Page 194
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 82, Number 414
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018