Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín de Eleta, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1707BornBurgo de Osma
18 Dec 176962.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
21 Jan 177062.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
31 Oct 178679.2SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osma, Spain
18 Dec 178679.4ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osma, Spain
4 Dec 178881.3DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín de Eleta:
Archbishop Joaquín de Eleta O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 87, Number 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 322, and Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015