Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Fernández Tobar

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1710Born
12 Mar 177059.7AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
24 Jun 177060.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
20 Aug 177060.2DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Fernández Tobar
Bishop Antonio Fernández Tobar (born , died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalencia, Diocese of Palencia

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 87, Number 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,770, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast