Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Lorenzo Irigoyen Dutari

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1712BornErrazu
20 Jun 176855.8AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
4 Sep 176856.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
21 Mar 177865.6DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Lorenzo Irigoyen Dutari:
Bishop Juan Lorenzo Irigoyen Dutari (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 86, Number 434

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013