Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Macías Pedrejón

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1705Born
23 May 175751.8AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
19 Aug 175752.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
27 Dec 177065.4DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Manuel Macías Pedrejón
Bishop Manuel Macías Pedrejón (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBecerril de Campos

  • a bishop for 13.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,884
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 75, Number 367
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast