Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás José Ruiz Montes

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1666BornGranada
9 Apr 168923.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 171650.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
9 Feb 171650.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
15 Mar 172357.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Oviedo, Spain
11 Sep 172458.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cartagena (en España)
11 Dec 174175.9DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Tomás José Ruiz Montes:
Archbishop Tomás José Ruiz Montes (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 145, and Page 300
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 352
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013