Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Bonaventura

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1643³BornUrbino
1666¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 171167.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
24 Feb 171167.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
7 Feb 172177.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Bonaventura:
Archbishop Alessandro Bonaventura (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazianzus

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 283
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 5
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,437

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015