Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Maria Borromeo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1666BornPadova
20 Nov 168922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
30 Aug 171346.7AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
3 Sep 171346.7Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
7 Jul 173366.6ResignedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
24 Feb 173871.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Anton Maria Borromeo:
Bishop Anton Maria Borromeo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015