Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Guerriero

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1667BornCammarota
22 Dec 169124.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 171850.3AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
18 Apr 171850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
30 Apr 173264.3DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Guerriero:
Bishop Nicola Guerriero (born , died ) Bishop of Ravello e Scala

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013