Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Acerno

Deceased

Bishop of Muro Lucano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1655BornGuardia
5 Mar 167822.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 171862.5AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
18 Apr 171862.5Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
22 Sep 172468.9DiedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Acerno:
Bishop Angelo Acerno (born , died ) Bishop of Muro Lucano

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015