Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchor Angel Gutiérrez Vallejo

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1680³Born
28 Mar 172949.0AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
29 May 172949.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
9 Dec 173454.7DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchor Angel Gutiérrez Vallejo
Bishop Melchor Angel Gutiérrez Vallejo (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoza de la Sal

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 305
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 47, Number 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018