Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Francisco Antonio de Escandón, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1723AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
25 Jul 1723Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
18 Jun 1731AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
28 Apr 1739DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Antonio de Escandón
Archbishop Juan Francisco Antonio de Escandón C.R. (died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,541
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 41, Number 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 167
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017