Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Marín y Ibáñez

Deceased

Bishop of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1680³BornSanta Coloma
22 Nov 173050.8AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
18 Feb 173151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
8 Jan 173453.9DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Marín y Ibáñez:
Bishop José Marín y Ibáñez (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 49, Number 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015