Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pereto Ricarte, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Almería


Events

DateEventTitle
1718²AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
12 Apr 1723AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
13 Jun 1723Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
28 Mar 1730DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Pereto Ricarte:
Bishop José Pereto Ricarte O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Almería

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,474
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 42, Number 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015