Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Antonio Cardinal de Borja-Centelles y Ponce de Léon

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1659Born
21 Jun 170041.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jul 170142.3AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
31 Jul 1701³42.3Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
3 Apr 170243.0AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
3 Apr 170243.0DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio de Borja-Centelles y Ponce de Léon
Francisco Antonio Cardinal de Borja-Centelles y Ponce de Léon (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari

  • a bishop for .6 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jun 1700
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,251
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 21, Number 17
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast