Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Díez Santos de San Pedro

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1654³Born
12 Mar 171459.9SelectedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
28 May 171460.1ConfirmedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
22 Jul 171460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
24 Oct 171965.5DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Díez Santos de San Pedro
Bishop José Díez Santos de San Pedro (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLobera de la Vega

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,639
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,877
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 30, Number 81
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,714, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast