Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Rodríguez Mendarozqueta y Zárate

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1655³BornTrespuentes
16 Apr 171458.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
1 Jul 171458.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
26 Feb 172266.3DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Rodríguez Mendarozqueta y Zárate:
Bishop Francisco Rodríguez Mendarozqueta y Zárate (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,636
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 29, Number 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015