Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Azpeitia y Sáenz de Santamaria

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1761BornTorrecilla de los Cameros
25 Sep 181453.3SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
19 Dec 181453.5ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
12 Feb 181553.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
19 Dec 182463.5SelectedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
21 Mar 182563.8ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
1 Nov 184079.4DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Azpeitia y Sáenz de Santamaria
Bishop José Antonio Azpeitia y Sáenz de Santamaria (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 1
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 136, and Page 244
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 129, Number 693

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016