Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Cienfuegos

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1755BornSan Martín de Leiguarda
22 Jul 181660.9AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
3 Nov 181661.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
22 Jan 182771.4DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Cienfuegos
Bishop Bartolomé Cienfuegos (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 58
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 135, Number 725

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016