Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Cordón Leyva

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1764Born
25 Mar 182460.0SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
3 May 182460.1ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
25 Jul 182460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
3 Apr 182763.0DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Cordón Leyva
Bishop Juan José Cordón Leyva (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuevas Altas

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 140, Number 756
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018