Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Díez de Bedoya, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Titular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)

Titular See: (Manuel María de San Lúcar de Barrameda)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1781Born
24 Dec 180221.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 182544.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
19 Dec 182544.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
9 Apr 182645.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
26 Dec 185170.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Díez de Bedoya
Bishop Tomás Díez de Bedoya O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lúcar de Barrameda

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 144, Number 778
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018