Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Rodríguez Carrillo, O.S.Bas. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1769BornVillanueva del Ariscal, Spain
8 Mar 181646.8AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
21 Jul 181647.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
12 Mar 182858.8DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Rodríguez Carrillo:
Bishop Gregorio Rodríguez Carrillo O.S.Bas. (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 134, Number 719

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013