Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciso López Borricón

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1777BornHornillayuso
25 Jun 182750.3AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
4 Nov 182750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
10 Dec 183962.8DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Franciso López Borricón:
Bishop Franciso López Borricón (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 145, Number 786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013