Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Martínez Carlón y Teruel

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1768BornLorca
25 Jun 182758.8AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
4 Nov 182759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
24 Oct 183163.1SelectedBishop of Jaén, Spain
24 Feb 183263.5ConfirmedBishop of Jaén, Spain
28 Aug 183668.0DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Martínez Carlón y Teruel:
Bishop Diego Martínez Carlón y Teruel (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 204, and Page 363
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 145, Number 787

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013