Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Martínez Riaguas

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1785Born
1813¹27.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 181933.6SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
29 Mar 181933.7ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
20 Jun 181933.9Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
24 Oct 182439.3DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Martínez Riaguas
Bishop Guillermo Martínez Riaguas (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNoviales

  • a priest for 11.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 138, Number 743
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,819, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast