Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Lomellino, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1753Born
21 Sep 177622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Jun 179642.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
3 Jul 179642.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Lomellino
Bishop Ferdinando Lomellino O.S.B. (born ) Titular Bishop of Antipatris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018