Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominque Charles Marie Turchi, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Parma

Note/Previous Titular See: (Adeodato di Parma)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1724BornParma
24 Sep 174723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Sep 178864.1AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
21 Sep 178864.1Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
2 Sep 180379.0DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dominque Charles Marie Turchi
Bishop Dominque Charles Marie Turchi O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 329
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016