Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Antun Sintić

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1754³BornVeglia
3 Dec 179238.1AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
9 Dec 179238.1Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
9 May 183782.5DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Antun Sintić
Bishop Ivan Antun Sintić (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 434
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 390
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016