Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Maria Visconti

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1721Born
5 Apr 174927.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 May 174927.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 178462.8AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
27 Jun 178462.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Dec 180180.3DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria Visconti (VIAF: 34882488)
Archbishop Filippo Maria Visconti (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassino Visconti, Diocese of Novara
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 284
  • c34: CB, 15 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 15
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017