Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Trenta

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1731³BornAscoli Piceno
30 Nov 178453.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178554.4AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
2 Oct 178554.4Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
13 Mar 179664.8DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Trenta:
Bishop Filippo Trenta (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a priest for 11.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016